This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 14:19:10 (UTC).

PAULA ALVIZURI VS DAVID MIRELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 PAULA ALVIZURI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID MIRELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5634

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVIZURI PAULA

Defendants

MIRELES DAVID

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING L.P.

PERFORMACE TEAM LOGISTICS LLC DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNHAM DONALD T.

Defendant Attorney

VASQUEZ DAVIL R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/17/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/29/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

10/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/23/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

10/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/22/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2023
  • Hearing09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Hearing03/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Hearing03/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by David Mireles (Defendant); Performace Team Logistics LLC (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Mireles (Defendant); Performace Team Logistics LLC (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by David Mireles (Defendant); Performace Team Logistics LLC (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Paula Alvizuri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Paula Alvizuri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Filing Proof of Service); Filed by Paula Alvizuri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Paula Alvizuri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paula Alvizuri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paula Alvizuri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paula Alvizuri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNHAM DONALD TILDON