This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 17:55:46 (UTC).

PAUL W. HERBERT VS AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 PAUL W HERBERT filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7094

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERBERT PAUL W.

Defendants

DAVIES DONALD KEVIN

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA AIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZLICH ALLAN EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

AVER RAYMOND HILLEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/6/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

7/19/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/14/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

8/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

9/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Answer

7/19/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

10/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

10/21/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • Hearing11/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Raymond Hillel Aver (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DONALD KEVIN DAVIES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PAUL W. HERBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AVER RAYMOND H. ATTORNEY AT LAW