This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 00:52:40 (UTC).

PAUL ONAGHINOR VS SUPERSHUTTLE LOS ANGELES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 PAUL ONAGHINOR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SUPERSHUTTLE LOS ANGELES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1548

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONAGHINOR PAUL

Defendants

BLACKSTREET CAPITAL HOLDINGS

SUPERSHUTTLE LOS ANGELES INC.

TRANSDEV CONSUMER SERVICES AND WHC ZSHUTTLE LLC

TRANSDEV NORTH AMERICA

TRANSDEV ON DEMAND INC.

TRANSDEV CONSUMER SERVICES

WHC ZSHUTTLE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLEMAN MARC ALLEN

Defendant Attorney

KUSKOVA OLGA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/8/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/8/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

11/18/2022: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/09/2022

11/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/09/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

11/7/2022: Notice of Settlement

Answer

11/4/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE

10/20/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE

Case Management Statement

10/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/14/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/1/2022: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Paul Onaghinor on 09/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Paul Onaghinor as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Paul Onaghinor (Plaintiff); As to: Supershuttle Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant); Transdev on Demand, Inc. (Defendant); Transdev North America (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 74 - Hon. Colin P. Leiseffective 01/09/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/30/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Transdev on Demand, Inc. (Defendant), Supershuttle Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant), Transdev North America (Defendant), Transdev Consumer Services and WHC Zshuttle LLC (Defendant), Blackstreet Capital Holdings (Defendant) to Transdev on Demand, Inc. (Defendant), Transdev Consumer Services and WHC Zshuttle LLC (Defendant), Supershuttle Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant), Transdev North America (Defendant), Blackstreet Capital Holdings (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAddress for Marc Allen Coleman (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Paul Onaghinor (Plaintiff); As to: Supershuttle Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant); Transdev on Demand, Inc. (Defendant); Transdev North America (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Paul Onaghinor (Plaintiff); As to: Supershuttle Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant); Transdev on Demand, Inc. (Defendant); Transdev North America (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSDEV NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSDEV ON DEMAND INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Allen Coleman