This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2023 at 06:01:31 (UTC).

OESTERLE VS ASMODUS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 OESTERLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ASMODUS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3430

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OESTERLE PAUL

PAUL OESTERLE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CLOUDSCAPE VAPE

ASMODUS INCORPORATION

DOES 1-25

ASMOSUS INC.

MECH ENERGY SOURCE

VAPE CLOUDSCAPE

Cross Defendants

MECHANICAL ENERGY SOURCE INC. (DOE 26)

MRL DISTRIBUTOR LLC (DOE 27)

DOES 26-50

ASMOSUS INC.

LUCKY DEUCES VAPOR COMPANY LLC (DOE 28)

PERFECTION PEN LLC (DOE 30)

LUCKY DEUCES VAPOR COMPANY LLC DOE 28

PERFECTION PEN LLC DOE 30

MECHANICAL ENERGY SOURCE INC. DOE 26

MRL DISTRIBUTOR LLC DOE 27

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RONALD J. SOKOL

RONALD J. SOKOL

Defendant Attorneys

G&P|SCHICK

MALCOLM D. SCHICK ESQ.

NATHAN A. COLARUSSO

TIM HARRIS

Cross Defendant Attorney

BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/18/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -

7/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

1/8/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ADVANCE OR FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SELLING

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ADVANCE OR FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SELLING

Minute Order -

10/11/2017: Minute Order -

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

10/12/2017: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Minute Order -

10/12/2017: Minute Order -

SUMMONS -

5/31/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY, INCLUDING PRODUCTS LIABILITY)

5/31/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY, INCLUDING PRODUCTS LIABILITY)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/9/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

6/15/2017: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Summons on Cross Complaint -

7/5/2017: Summons on Cross Complaint -

CLOUDSCAPE, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; ETC

7/5/2017: CLOUDSCAPE, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; ETC

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLOUDSCAPE, INC. TO COMPLAINT

7/5/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CLOUDSCAPE, INC. TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT, ASMODUS, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/18/2017: DEFENDANT, ASMODUS, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO STRIKE MATTERS FROM COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED) ORDER THEREON

8/3/2017: STIPULATION TO STRIKE MATTERS FROM COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED) ORDER THEREON

STIPULATION TO STRIKE MATTERS FROM COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

8/3/2017: STIPULATION TO STRIKE MATTERS FROM COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S; Filed by ASMOSUS, INC. (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (AS TO COMPEL WITH PREJ X-COMP FILED BY CLOUDSCAPE, INC ON 7/5/17 WITH PREJ ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:29 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion for Order - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by CLOUDSCAPE VAPE (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketNotice (OF TAKING MTN FOR ORDER OFF OFF CALENDAR ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered (AGAINST: PERFECTION PEN, LLC ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
116 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Paul Oesterle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paul Oesterle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY, INCLUDING PRODUCTS LIABILITY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less