This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2023 at 07:41:36 (UTC).

PAUL MARCIANI VS CITY OF INGLEWOOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 PAUL MARCIANI filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF INGLEWOOD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4104

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCIANI PAUL

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CITY OF INGLEWOOD

CITY OF INGLEWOOD PUBLIC WORKS DEPARTMENT

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF SANITATION

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

LOSS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOOD SCOTT M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GANDY PATRICIA K.

GLAZER WILLIAM J

WILLIAMS ESQ CRANSTON

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

10/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Request for Dismissal

11/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

11/8/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

10/24/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

10/11/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

10/6/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEF'ENDANT CITY OF'LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/4/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEF'ENDANT CITY OF'LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Answer

9/26/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

9/22/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Answer

9/1/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2024
  • Hearing07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2024
  • Hearing01/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: City of Los Angeles Department of Sanitation (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Department of Public Works (Defendant); Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Paul Marciani on 07/26/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Paul Marciani as to City of Los Angeles Department of Sanitation, City of Los Angeles Department of Public Works, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, and City of Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Paul Marciani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAddress for Scott M. Good, Esq. (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Order STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Filed by: Paul Marciani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Paul Marciani on 07/26/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Paul Marciani as to County of Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Paul Marciani (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Paul Marciani (Plaintiff); As to: City of Inglewood (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Department of Sanitation (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Department of Public Works (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Paul Marciani (Plaintiff); As to: City of Inglewood (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Department of Sanitation (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Department of Public Works (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less