Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 04:12:48 (UTC).

PAUL J BEHRMAN ET AL VS CELERITY PARTNERS III LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 PAUL J BEHRMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CELERITY PARTNERS III LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3120

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TAGTMEIER STEVEN C.

BEHRMAN PAUL J.

Defendants and Respondents

LYON CLIFFORD A.

ADAMSON STEPHEN E.

BENHAM MARK R.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

CELERITY PARTNERS III LLC

CELEBRITY PARTNERS III LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAMBIRTH TIMOTHY A. ESQ.

ORTH M. RENEE

LAMBIRTH TIMOTHY A

ORTH M RENEE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON

MOSS JONATHAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

RULING; ETC.

2/9/2018: RULING; ETC.

NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III, LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAMSON, MARK R. BENHAM AND CLIFFORD A. LYON'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

2/15/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III, LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAMSON, MARK R. BENHAM AND CLIFFORD A. LYON'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND EXHIBIT A TH683120ERETO

4/30/2018: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND EXHIBIT A TH683120ERETO

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL MARK BENHAM TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, REQUEST 17.1

5/11/2018: PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL MARK BENHAM TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, REQUEST 17.1

PLAINTIFF, PAUL BEHRMAN'S VOLUME OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO COMPEL MARK HFNHAM TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, REQUESTS 13,21,23 AND FOR SANCTIONS

5/11/2018: PLAINTIFF, PAUL BEHRMAN'S VOLUME OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO COMPEL MARK HFNHAM TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, REQUESTS 13,21,23 AND FOR SANCTIONS

PLAINTIFF, PAUL BEHRMAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL MARK BENHAM TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, REQUESTS 13,21,23 AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF

5/11/2018: PLAINTIFF, PAUL BEHRMAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL MARK BENHAM TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, REQUESTS 13,21,23 AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF

APPENDIX OF AUTHORITY LODGED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF, PAUL BEHRMAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL STEPHEN ADAMSON TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, REQUESTS 13,21,23 AND FOR

5/11/2018: APPENDIX OF AUTHORITY LODGED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF, PAUL BEHRMAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL STEPHEN ADAMSON TO SERVE FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, REQUESTS 13,21,23 AND FOR

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON JULY 5, 2018 AND JULY 17, 2018, TO JULY 26, 2018, TO BE HEARD WITH RELATED MOTIONS TO COMPEL

6/12/2018: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL SET FOR HEARING ON JULY 5, 2018 AND JULY 17, 2018, TO JULY 26, 2018, TO BE HEARD WITH RELATED MOTIONS TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/2/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Case Management Statement

10/18/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Other -

11/28/2018: Other -

Request for Judicial Notice

2/26/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Other -

4/30/2019: Other -

DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III, LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAM SON, MARK R. BENHAM AND CLIFFORD A. LYON'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

1/24/2018: DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III, LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAM SON, MARK R. BENHAM AND CLIFFORD A. LYON'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/16/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Celebrity Partners III, LLC (Defendant); Stephen E. Adamson (Defendant); Mark R. Benham (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (or in the alternative Summary Adjudication) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (- David A. Salyer, CSR, RMR, CRR, #4410)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the alternative ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Order (- Court's Order on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Objection (DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III, LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAMSON, MARK E. BENHAM, CLIFFORD A. LYON AND CELERITY PARTNERS, INC'S ("DOE 1"): OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION F); Filed by Celebrity Partners III, LLC (Defendant); Stephen E. Adamson (Defendant); Mark R. Benham (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Reply (DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III, LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAMSON, MARK E. BENHAM, CLIFFORD A. LYON AND CELERITY PARTNERS, INC'S ("DOE 1"): REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS INCLUDED IN PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT); Filed by Celebrity Partners III, LLC (Defendant); Stephen E. Adamson (Defendant); Mark R. Benham (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Reply (DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III,LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAMSON, MARK R. BENHAM, CLIFFORD A. LYON AND CELERITY PARTNERS, INC.'S ("DOE 1"): REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS INCLUDED IN PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SEPERATE STATEMENT); Filed by Celebrity Partners III, LLC (Defendant); Stephen E. Adamson (Defendant); Mark R. Benham (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Reply (DEFENDANTS CELERITY PARTNERS III, LLC, STEPHEN E. ADAMSON, MARK R BENHAM, CLIFFORD A. LYON AND CELERITY PARTNERS, INC.'S ("DOE 1"): REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Celebrity Partners III, LLC (Defendant); Stephen E. Adamson (Defendant); Mark R. Benham (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Paul J. Behrman (Plaintiff); Steven C. Tagtmeier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Paul J. Behrman (Plaintiff); Steven C. Tagtmeier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Paul J. Behrman (Plaintiff); Steven C. Tagtmeier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Paul J. Behrman (Plaintiff); Steven C. Tagtmeier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENET CONFERNCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Paul J. Behrman (Plaintiff); Steven C. Tagtmeier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONACT (LLC AGREEMENT) ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less