This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 09:56:34 (UTC).

PAUL HONDROS VS LA TORTILLA FACTORY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 PAUL HONDROS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LA TORTILLA FACTORY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1211

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HONDROS PAUL AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

LA TORTILLA FACTORY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

D'ABUSCO MATTHEW S.

D'ABUSCO MATTHEW SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

LOW NATHAN K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/4/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/4/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/11/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/11/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/7/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/25/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/22/2019: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Paul, Hondros, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LA TORTILLA FACTORY INC. Erroneously Sued As LA TORTILLA FACTORY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LA TORTILLA FACTORY INC. Erroneously Sued As LA TORTILLA FACTORY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Paul, Hondros, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paul, Hondros, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paul, Hondros, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paul, Hondros, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Low, Nathan K