This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 21:16:07 (UTC).

PAUL GONZALEZ VS HAYMAN PROPERTIES LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 PAUL GONZALEZ filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against HAYMAN PROPERTIES LLC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5840

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ PAUL

Defendants

LOUIS VUITTON USA INC.

ADVANTAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

HAYMAN PROPERTIES LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'HARA KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

LOUREIRO KARL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/21/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; PROPOSED ORDER

10/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; PROPOSED ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; (PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

11/18/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; (PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; (PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

11/18/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; (PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/27/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Answer

11/23/2020: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Hearing01/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; (PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON); Filed by Paul Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by Paul Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hayman Properties LLC. (Defendant); Louis Vuitton USA Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES; PROPOSED ORDER); Filed by Hayman Properties LLC. (Defendant); Louis Vuitton USA Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paul Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paul Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paul Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANTAGE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where LOUIS VUITTON USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOUREIRO KARL R.