Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 05:32:19 (UTC).

PAUL COHEN VS LINA BAHNAN

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 PAUL COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LINA BAHNAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9496

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN PAUL

Defendants

BAHNAN LINA

BAHNAN MARAM

BAHNAN JIMMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLDREN KENNETH A

BRUSAVICH BRUCE M.

Defendant Attorney

TERCERO NAPOLEON G. III

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/12/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/8/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Demand for Jury Trial

8/3/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/3/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/26/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lina Bahnan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Paul Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Paul Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lina Bahnan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lina Bahnan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paul Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paul Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paul Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paul Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV19496    Hearing Date: May 26, 2021    Dept: 28

Motion to Quash Service

Having considered the moving papersthe Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On May 21, 2020, Plaintiff Paul Cohen (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants Lina Bahnan motor vehicle and general negligence arising from a motor vehicle accident that occurred on June 17, 2019.

On ober 8, 2020, Plaintiff filed an amendment to complaint, substituting in Maram Antoun Bahnan

On November 12, 2020, Plaintiff filed an amendment to complaint, substituting in Jimmy Bahnan

On April 26, 2021, Defendant Lina Bahnan

Trial is set for November 18, 2021

PARTYS

Defendant Lina Bahnan and complaint on co-defendant Maram Bahnan the summons and complaint were not properly served.

LEGAL STANDARD

“A defendant . . . may serve and file a notice of motion for one or more of the following purposes:  (1) To quash service of summons on the ground of lack of jurisdiction of the court over him or her. . . .”  (Code Civ. Proc., § 418.10(a).)  “[C]ompliance (Dill v. Berquist Construction Co. Id. Coulston v. Cooper Ruttenberg v. Ruttenberg (1997) 53 Cal.App.4th 801, 808.)

DISCUSSION

Defendant Lina Bahnan Maram Bahnan purportedly effected on November 4, 2020.  Lina Bahnan Maram Bahnan.

CONCLUSION

Based on the foregoing, the service is DENIED.

Defendant Lina Bahnan ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Defendant Lina Bahnan ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.¿

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLDREN KENNETH A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUSAVICH BRUCE M. ESQ.