This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 13:20:41 (UTC).

PATTY DOUGHERTY VS THE QUEEN MARY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 PATTY DOUGHERTY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE QUEEN MARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3525

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUGHERTY PATTY

Defendants

EAGLE HOSPITALITY

THE QUEEN MARY

CITY OF LONG BEACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

VIGUS TODD

Other Attorneys

WECK CORY RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/28/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/23/2021: PI General Order

Answer

7/1/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

9/22/2021: Declaration - AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2024
  • Hearing01/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAmended Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by Patty Dougherty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Long Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Patty Dougherty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Patty Dougherty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patty Dougherty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patty Dougherty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patty Dougherty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patty Dougherty (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAGLE HOSPITALITY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where THE QUEEN MARY is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WECK CORY R.