This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 08:45:19 (UTC).

PATTANAM SRINIVASSAN VS BRIAN GROSSMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 PATTANAM SRINIVASSAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRIAN GROSSMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1004

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

SRINIVASSAN PATTANAM

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

GROSSMAN BRIAN

NASO MICHAEL ANTHONY

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

OLSON SHAWN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

CARPENTER JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

6/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

11/30/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

11/9/2020: Answer

Answer

10/23/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR FRAUD; NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; CALIFORNIA LEGAL REMEDIES ACT VIOLATIONS; UNLAWFUL BUSNISS ACTS & PRACTICES

10/26/2020: Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR FRAUD; NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION; CALIFORNIA LEGAL REMEDIES ACT VIOLATIONS; UNLAWFUL BUSNISS ACTS & PRACTICES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

7/29/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Brian Grossman (Defendant); Carpenter, Zuckerman, & Rowley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brian Grossman (Defendant); Carpenter, Zuckerman, & Rowley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint (for Fraud; Negligent Misrepresentation; California Legal Remedies Act Violations; Unlawful Busniss Acts & Practices); Filed by Brian Grossman (Defendant); Carpenter, Zuckerman, & Rowley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brian Grossman (Defendant); Carpenter, Zuckerman, & Rowley (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Pattanam Srinivassan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARPENTER JOHN C. ESQ.