This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 02:08:47 (UTC).

PATRICK W. DENNIS, ET AL. VS ALFA LAVAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 PATRICK W DENNIS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALFA LAVAL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8725

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DENNIS PATRICK W.

DENNIS ROSA

Defendants

ALFA LAVAL INC.

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

FLOWSERVE US INC.

CLA-VAL CO.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY AKA NAPA

GARDNER-DENVER INC.

WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA INC. FKA ATWOOD & MORRILL

SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR INC.

INGERSOLL RAND CO.

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

WARREN PUMPS LLC

PARKER-HANNIFAN CORPORATION

ITT CORPORATION DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FROST SCOTT L

CARON JOHN M

Defendant Attorneys

LISTER JOHN R.

PRINDLE KENNETH B.

KUM ROBERT

AMEELE KEITH M.

BAIME COLLEEN E.

POND FRANK D.

BROSAMLE ANTHONY D.

DEJARDIN BRADFORD JOHN

CUNNINGHAM JAMES P.

NICHOLS STEPHEN M.

BERGSTROM EMILY DIANE

JENKINS CHARLES W.

REEG ANA TERESA

SEITZ ANDREW LON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT DICK BLICK COM...)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT DICK BLICK COM...)

Objection - DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FEDERAL REGULATIONS

12/11/2020: Objection - DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FEDERAL REGULATIONS

Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE

11/9/2020: Order - ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE

Opposition - DEFENDANT, GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S JOINT DEFENSE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY SPECULATION BY DEFENSE EXPERTS THAT THE U.S. NAVY KEPT MANUFACTURERS FROM PROVIDI

10/23/2020: Opposition - DEFENDANT, GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S JOINT DEFENSE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE ANY SPECULATION BY DEFENSE EXPERTS THAT THE U.S. NAVY KEPT MANUFACTURERS FROM PROVIDI

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO GENUINE PARTS COMPANY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 33 TO EXCLUDE THE PHOTOGRAPH IN EXHIBIT 24 TO THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF PATRICK DENNIS

10/23/2020: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO GENUINE PARTS COMPANY'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 33 TO EXCLUDE THE PHOTOGRAPH IN EXHIBIT 24 TO THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF PATRICK DENNIS

Witness List - JOINT WITNESS LIST

10/26/2020: Witness List - JOINT WITNESS LIST

Notice - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/13/2020: Notice - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 22 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR WITNESSES FROM REFERRING TO PLAINTIFF, MR. DENNIS AND OTHER INDIVID

10/21/2020: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 22 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS AND THEIR WITNESSES FROM REFERRING TO PLAINTIFF, MR. DENNIS AND OTHER INDIVID

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S JOINT MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE VIDEOTAPE WORK SIMULATIONS AND OTHER TESTIMONY OF WILLIAM LONGO AND MEASUREMENT OF ASBES

10/21/2020: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S JOINT MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE VIDEOTAPE WORK SIMULATIONS AND OTHER TESTIMONY OF WILLIAM LONGO AND MEASUREMENT OF ASBES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW SEITZ

10/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW SEITZ

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW SEITZ

10/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW SEITZ

Motion in Limine - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE SPECULATION OF JOHN SPENCER, (MIL NO. 12)

10/7/2020: Motion in Limine - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE SPECULATION OF JOHN SPENCER, (MIL NO. 12)

Motion in Limine - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE WHAT THE U.S. NAVY KNEW CONCERNING THE DANGERS OF ASBESTOS (MIL NO. 6)

10/7/2020: Motion in Limine - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE WHAT THE U.S. NAVY KNEW CONCERNING THE DANGERS OF ASBESTOS (MIL NO. 6)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLANCY B. CORNWALL IN SUPPORT OF GARDNER DENVER, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

9/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CLANCY B. CORNWALL IN SUPPORT OF GARDNER DENVER, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CLA-VAL CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/18/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CLA-VAL CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement - DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUM

9/18/2020: Separate Statement - DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUM

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/15/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Answer

12/19/2019: Answer

315 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • Hearing08/10/2021 at 13:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Denns-20STCV38725)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Hearing04/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Status Conference ((Frost Law Firm)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal (Settlement) (Denns-20STCV38725)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Frost Law Firm); Order to Show Cause Re: D...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketReply (In Support Of Motion To Tax Costs As To Defendant Gardner Denver Inc.); Filed by Patrick W. Dennis (Plaintiff); Rosa Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (as to Defendant Dick Blick Company (Dennis-19STCV38725)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs as to Defendant Dick Blick Com...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Granting Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Filed by Alfa Laval, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
339 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Parker-Hannifan Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cla-Val Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Patrick W. Dennis (Plaintiff); Rosa Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrick W. Dennis (Plaintiff); Rosa Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrick W. Dennis (Plaintiff); Rosa Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY is a litigant