This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:21:55 (UTC).

PATRICK VARDAPOUR VS MAGDY ZOUEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 PATRICK VARDAPOUR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAGDY ZOUEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7822

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

VARDAPOUR PATRICK

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

ZOUEN MAGDA

ZOUEN MAGDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VARDAPOUR LAW GROUP

VARDAPOUR PATRICK

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEVINE ZACHARY ESQ.

LEVINE ZACHARY JAMES ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE ZACHARY JAMES ESQ.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

VARDAPOUR PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Motion for Sanctions

6/10/2019: Motion for Sanctions

Separate Statement

6/10/2019: Separate Statement

Opposition

6/19/2019: Opposition

Separate Statement

6/19/2019: Separate Statement

Objection

6/25/2019: Objection

Reply

6/25/2019: Reply

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

7/1/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application

7/2/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

7/2/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/3/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

8/8/2019: Declaration

Motion for Protective Order

8/8/2019: Motion for Protective Order

Request for Judicial Notice

8/8/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/15/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. UNJUST ENRICHMENT; 3. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; 4. UNJUST ENRICHMENT; AND 5. DECLARATORY RELIEF

2/16/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. UNJUST ENRICHMENT; 3. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; 4. UNJUST ENRICHMENT; AND 5. DECLARATORY RELIEF

REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION

2/20/2018: REJECTION OF AWARD AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL AFTER ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/21/2018: DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

REQUEST FOR REFUND

3/27/2018: REQUEST FOR REFUND

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Michael J. Armenta); Filed by Patrick Vardapour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Patrick Vardapour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order (Restricting Use of Document Production); Filed by Patrick Vardapour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Patrick Vardapour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Patrick Vardapour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT MAGDA ZOUEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT MAGDY ZOUEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNT STATED (RABADI MATTER) ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrick Vardapour (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7822    Hearing Date: February 24, 2020    Dept: 74

****7822 PATRICK VARDAPOUR VS MAGDY ZOUEN ET AL

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents

TENTATIVE RULING: The motions are untimely and are DENIED. Moving party to give notice.

Requests for Judicial Notice

The parties’ requests for judicial notice are GRANTED.

Motions to Compel Further Responses

Defendant served responses on November 5, 2019. Plaintiff had until December 26, 2019 to file motions to compel further responses. These motions were filed on January 6, 2020. The motions are untimely.



Case Number: ****7822    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 74

****7822 PATRICK VARDAPOUR VS MAGDY ZOUEN ET AL

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Further Responses, Requests for Admissions

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is DENIED. Moving party to give notice.

Requests for Judicial Notice

Plaintiff’s request to take judicial notice of documents of this court is GRANTED. (Evid. Code, ; 452(d)(1).)

Defendants’ request to take judicial notice of California Senate and Assembly committee reports and analysis of bills is GRANTED. (Evid. Code, ; 452(c).) Plaintiff’s objection to this request is overruled.

Motion to Compel Further Responses

Code of Civil Procedure ; 2033.290(c) states that the time limit for bringing a motion to compel further responses runs from the service of a verified response or supplemental verified response. Defendant served responses to the RFA on November 5, 2019. Plaintiff had until December 26, 2019 to file a motion to compel further responses. This motion was filed on January 6, 2020. The motion is untimely.


Case Number: ****7822    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 74

****7822 PATRICK VARDAPOUR VS MAGDY ZOUEN ET AL

Plaintiff’s Motion for Issue or Evidence Sanctions and for Sanctions

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is denied. The request for sanctions is denied.

Motion for Issue or Evidence Sanctions and for Sanctions

The motion seeks issue and evidence sanctions based on the failure to comply with a court order compelling production of documents.

Defendants maintain they have produced all documents in their possession. A respondent cannot be compelled to admit a fact in discovery, even where its truth is obvious. (Wimberly v. Derby Cycle Corp. (1997) 56 Cal. App. 4th 618, 634.) Plaintiff is arguing that he thinks defendants should have more documents. This is not a proper ground for a terminating sanction. That defendants did not produce documents which plaintiff produced to them earlier in this litigation does not establish they are withholding documents from the underlying actions.

The motion is denied.

Monetary Sanctions

The request for monetary sanction is denied. The request for monetary sanctions for a prior motion can only be brought as a separate motion for reconsideration.



Case Number: ****7822    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 74

****7822 PATRICK VARDAPOUR VS MAGDY ZOUEN ET AL

Plaintiff Patrick Vardapour’s Motion to Compel Production to Requests for Production, Set 2

TENTATIVE RULING: Plaintiff’s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Production to Requests for Production Set 2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling and reserving a hearing date for a motion to compel further responses to discovery. Sanctions are awarded against Plaintiff in the amount of $1,469.60.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARDARPOUR PATRICK