Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 15:12:00 (UTC).

PATRICK THOMAS VS THOMAS HUGH MCGLADE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 PATRICK THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THOMAS HUGH MCGLADE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0617

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS PATRICK

Defendants

MCGLADE THOMAS HUGH

TAYLOR KELLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMAS JOHN NICKOLAS

Defendant Attorneys

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

AVAKIAN ARMEN ALEXANDER

GERBER JONATHAN RYAN

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/4/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Association of Attorney

2/3/2021: Association of Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial

11/26/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/26/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/26/2019: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/9/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/28/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/28/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • Hearing08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Thomas Hugh McGlade (Defendant); Kellene Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Thomas Hugh McGlade (Defendant); Kellene Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Thomas Hugh McGlade (Defendant); Kellene Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Thomas Hugh McGlade (Defendant); Kellene Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thomas Hugh McGlade (Defendant); Kellene Taylor (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patrick Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrick Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrick Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John N Demas