This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 16:50:14 (UTC).

PATRICK MCCLANAHAN VS CIK POWER DISTRIBUTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 PATRICK MCCLANAHAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CIK POWER DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0307

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCLANAHAN PATRICK

Defendant

CIK POWER DISTRIBUTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANSANOWICZ LEONARD H.

Defendant Attorney

MASCHLER BRIAN P.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

2/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

Notice - NOTICE OF AMENDED ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

2/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF AMENDED ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE

Notice - NOTICE OF NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE: FINAL RULING IN JUDICIAL COUNCIL PETITION PROCEEDINGS

7/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER RE: FINAL RULING IN JUDICIAL COUNCIL PETITION PROCEEDINGS

Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL RULING IN JUDICIAL COUNCIL PETITION PROCEEDINGS

7/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF FINAL RULING IN JUDICIAL COUNCIL PETITION PROCEEDINGS

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

7/14/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/15/2020

7/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/15/2020

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/1/2020: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION) OF 07/08/2020

7/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION) OF 07/08/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION)

7/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION)

Notice - NOTICE OF THE CHAIR OF THE JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING

4/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF THE CHAIR OF THE JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/19/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION

2/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION

Complaint

1/6/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/14/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

1/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/14/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Amended Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge); Filed by Patrick McClanahan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge); Filed by Patrick McClanahan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Nunc Pro Tunc Order RE: Final Ruling in judicial council petition proceedings; Filed by Patrick McClanahan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Final Ruling in Judicial Council Petition Proceedings); Filed by Patrick McClanahan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Patrick McClanahan (Plaintiff); CIK Power Distributors, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Coordination)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Petition for Coordination) of 07/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by CIK Power Distributors, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by CIK Power Distributors, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docketat 11:31 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting Initial Status Conference) of 01/14/2020, Initial Status Conference order); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrick McClanahan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrick McClanahan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIK POWER DISTRIBUTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASCHLER, BRIAN P.