Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2021 at 03:00:42 (UTC).

PATRICK J. REITEN MD FACS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 PATRICK J REITEN MD FACS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2065

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICK J. REITEN MD FACS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PATRICK J. REITEN MD FACS

Defendants

CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Patrick J. Reiten MD FACS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Patrick J. Reiten MD FACS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patrick J. Reiten MD FACS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrick J. Reiten MD FACS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrick J. Reiten MD FACS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CA LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CA is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD