This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2022 at 17:16:09 (UTC).

PATRICK DICORATO VS BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT (CA) INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 PATRICK DICORATO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CA INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8756

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DICORATO PATRICK

Defendants

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CA INC.

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC.

CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY L.P.

TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIEFENBACH JAMES C.

Defendant Attorneys

DORSEY MARTHA

WRIGHTEN MARIE LEGGON

CRAMER KEITH C.

CARLSON ROBERT CARL JR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING A TELEPHONIC INFORMAL CONFERENCE;)

3/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING A TELEPHONIC INFORMAL CONFERENCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/8/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice - DEFENDANT CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS STATEMENT AS TO ITS PROPOSED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS IN PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/11/2022: Notice - DEFENDANT CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS STATEMENT AS TO ITS PROPOSED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS IN PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Joint Status Conference Report - DEFENDANT CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY AND PLAINTIFF PATRICK DICORATOS JOINT STATEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS PROPOSED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRI

3/14/2022: Joint Status Conference Report - DEFENDANT CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY AND PLAINTIFF PATRICK DICORATOS JOINT STATEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS PROPOSED DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRI

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE (TELEPHONIC);)

3/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE (TELEPHONIC);)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE (PLEADING))

1/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE (PLEADING))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE;)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/14/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Answer - TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Answer - TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/29/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE;)

11/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE;)

Initial Status Conference Report

10/13/2021: Initial Status Conference Report

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASEANYWHERE)

10/15/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASEANYWHERE)

Case Management Order

10/15/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

10/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/5/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFE...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIE L. WRIGHTEN IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION

8/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARIE L. WRIGHTEN IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Conference ((Telephonic)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Conference (Telephonic);)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDefendant Clune Construction Company And Plaintiff Patrick Dicorato?s Joint Statement As To Defendant Clune Construction Company?s Proposed Demurrer And Motion To Strike Class Allegations In Plaintiff?s First Amended Complaint; Filed by Patrick Dicorato (Plaintiff); Clune Construction Company, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDefendant Clune Construction Companys Statement As To Its Proposed Demurrer And Motion To Strike Class Allegations In Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint; Filed by Clune Construction Company, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docketat 10:15 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting a Telephonic Informal Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Conference ((Pleading)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Telephonic Conference (Pleading))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Initial Status Confe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 06/25/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrick Dicorato (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrick Dicorato (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGMENT CA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CLUNE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where TURNER CONSTRUCTION TURNER is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant