This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 05:43:36 (UTC).

PATRICIA WHEELER VS RADIOLOGY PARTNERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 PATRICIA WHEELER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RADIOLOGY PARTNERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0906

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELER PATRICIA

Defendant

RADIOLOGY PARTNERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/7/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

12/10/2020: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

4/5/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF STIPULATION) OF 03/30/2021

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF STIPULATION) OF 03/30/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF STIPULATION)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF STIPULATION)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

4/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/04/2022

DocketStatus Conference re: arbitration scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/04/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Patricia Wheeler on 12/07/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Patricia Wheeler as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Patricia Wheeler (Plaintiff); As to: Radiology Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2022

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Patricia Wheeler (Plaintiff); Result: Entered; Result Date: 04/01/2022; As To Parties changed from Radiology Partners, Inc. (Defendant) to Radiology Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: arbitration)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketStatus Conference re: arbitration scheduled for 10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/18/2022 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference re: arbitration scheduled for 10/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/18/2021 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2021

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Patricia Wheeler (Plaintiff); As to: Radiology Partners, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/16/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
03/30/2021

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/14/2021 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2020

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 04/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2020

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Patricia Wheeler (Plaintiff); As to: Radiology Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patricia Wheeler (Plaintiff); As to: Radiology Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Patricia Wheeler (Plaintiff); As to: Radiology Partners, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less