This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2023 at 02:46:32 (UTC).

PATRICIA SCHWADE VS SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 PATRICIA SCHWADE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, AMY D. HOGUE and LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4824

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

AMY D. HOGUE

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

SCHWADE PATRICIA

Respondents and Defendants

ZEMEL ELLIOT

BRIUS LLC

SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER LLC

BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO

SCHMUKLER YEHUDA

SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER

RECHNITZ SCHLOMO

SOUTH PASADENA REHABILITATION CENTER [DOE 1]

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER LLC

MILLBRAE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP

WESTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP

129 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LARSEN NEIL MICHAEL

KIRNOSOVA IRINA A.

Defendant Attorneys

MAZIN AMANDA LYNN

DYER ELIZABETH ROSE

MARASCHINO MARGARET GRACE

SAMUELS DONALD L.

AGHNAMI SANAM

LEE JOSEPH DANIEL

HEINICKE MALCOLM ALEXANDER

MORGAN JA'MESHA LA'SHAY

ANIFF OMAR MOHAMMED

BATISTE ASHLEY N.

GRUVER ERICA H.

DAUGHERTY MELISSA TARA

HYLAS STEPHEN A.

Respondent Attorneys

DENBLEYKER KATHERINE CAROL

BOXER JOSHUA DAVID ESQ.

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/30/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Memorandum of Costs on Appeal

5/25/2023: Memorandum of Costs on Appeal

Joint Status Conference Report

5/22/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

5/22/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Substitution of Attorney

5/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/12/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/11/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/11/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/11/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B314052

5/5/2023: Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B314052

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/26/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

392 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/07/2024

Hearing02/07/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Brius Management Co (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 05/30/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketMemorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by: South Pasadena Rehabilitation Center [Doe 1] (Respondent); Brius Management Co (Respondent); Brius, LLC (Respondent); Schlomo Rechnitz (Respondent); As to: Patricia Schwade (Appellant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 7

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by: South Pasadena Care Center LLC (Defendant); Bay Vista Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); Roseville Point Health & Wellness Center, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Continuing Further Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
614 More Docket Entries
04/02/2018

DocketProceeding/Event:Order-Complex Determination Carolyn B. Kuhl

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2018

DocketCalendaring:Initial Status Conference 06/15/18 at 10:00 am Carolyn B. Kuhl

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2018

DocketProceeding/Event:Affidavit of Prejudice Ann I. Jones 9:00 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2018

DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2018

DocketCivil Deposit; Filed by: Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2018

DocketDocument:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Employment Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less