This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 18:36:41 (UTC).

PATRICIA SCHWADE VS SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 PATRICIA SCHWADE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, AMY D. HOGUE and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4824

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

AMY D. HOGUE

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Appellant and Plaintiff

SCHWADE PATRICIA

Respondents and Defendants

ZEMEL ELLIOT

BRIUS LLC

SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER LLC

BRIUS MANAGEMENT CO

SCHMUKLER YEHUDA

DOES 1 TO 50

SCHLOMO RECHNITZ

SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

RECHNITZ SCHLOMO

JEG SO. PAS. TRUST #320

SOUTH PASADENA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

JEG SO. PAS. TRUST #230

SOUTH PASADENA REHABILITATION CENTER

SOUTH PASADENA REHABILITATION CENTER [DOE 1]

JEG SO. PAS. TRUST #230 [DOE 2]

CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER LLC

MILLBRAE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP

WESTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP

120 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BOXER JOSHUA DAVID ESQ.

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

MATERN MATTHEW JOHN ESQ.

KIRNOSOVA IRINA A.

LARSEN NEIL MICHAEL

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MATERN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

DYER ELIZABETH ROSE

HYLAS STEPHEN A.

MAZIN AMANDA LYNN

DAUGHERTY MELISSA TARA

AGHNAMI SANAM

LEE JOSEPH DANIEL

HEINICKE MALCOLM ALEXANDER

MORGAN JA'MESHA LA'SHAY

SAMUELS DONALD L.

DENBLEYKER KATHERINE CAROL

GRUVER ERICA H.

ANIFF OMAR MOHAMMED

MARASCHINO MARGARET GRACE

BATISTE ASHLEY N.

Respondent, Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BOXER JOSHUA DAVID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/20/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/20/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request for Judicial Notice

12/20/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Answer - DEFENDANT SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER, LLC, SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER, ELLIOT ZEMEL, AND YEHUDA SCHMUKLER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

12/20/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER, LLC, SOUTH PASADENA CARE CENTER, ELLIOT ZEMEL, AND YEHUDA SCHMUKLER'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/20/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/20/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/20/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/20/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration

12/20/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Brief - BRIEF COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/20/2021: Brief - BRIEF COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/20/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF APPEAL "U"

11/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF APPEAL "U"

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) "U"

12/15/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) "U"

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPEAL - NTC DESIGNATING RECORD OF APPEAL APP-003/010/103 "U"

12/15/2021: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - APPEAL - NTC DESIGNATING RECORD OF APPEAL APP-003/010/103 "U"

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHEN HYLAS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS

9/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHEN HYLAS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS

Brief - COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF REHAB CENTER DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

9/28/2021: Brief - COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF REHAB CENTER DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REHAB CENTER DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/28/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REHAB CENTER DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/28/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

323 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by South Pasadena Care Center LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDefendant South Pasadena Care Center, LLC, South Pasadena Care Center, Elliot Zemel, and Yehuda Schmukler's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint; Filed by South Pasadena Care Center LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
390 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 308; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Deposit -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Deposit; Filed by Patricia Schwade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Patricia Schwade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Docket-PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLEX - CLASS ACTION 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE REQUIRED MEAL PERIODS ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patricia Schwade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH PASADENA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTWOOD HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP is a litigant

Latest cases where CITRUS WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRIUS LLC is a litigant