This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 11:11:48 (UTC).

PATRICIA ROMERO VS M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 PATRICIA ROMERO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against M N FINANCING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9118

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMERO PATRICIA

Defendant

M&N FINANCING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLAGHER MARYANN P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/1/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

2/28/2023: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA ROMERO

2/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA ROMERO

Response - RESPONSE TO OSC

2/23/2023: Response - RESPONSE TO OSC

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/16/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

11/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Case Management Statement

11/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/8/2022: Response - RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/13/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/12/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • Hearing05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Response to the Order to Show Cause Regarding Entry of Default Judgment: Name Extension: blank ; Exact Name: Plaintiff's Response to the Order to Show Cause Regarding Entry of Default Judgment ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF PATRICIA ROMERO; Filed by: Patricia Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Patricia Romero (Plaintiff); As to: M&N Financing Corporation (Defendant); Total Costs: 2542.30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketResponse to OSC; Filed by: Patricia Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 76 - Hon. Christopher K. Lui; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Patricia Romero (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Barbara Meiers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Patricia Romero (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer CCP ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer CCP ...) of 03/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer CCP ...) of 03/15/2022: Status Date changed from 03/15/2022 to 03/15/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less