This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2021 at 22:35:54 (UTC).

PATRICIA RACINE VS CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 PATRICIA RACINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8643

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RACINE PATRICIA

Defendants

CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANAHEIM HILLS DAYCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHOBADI SHIREEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/29/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/11/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Request for Dismissal

12/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Patricia Racine (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patricia Racine (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patricia Racine (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patricia Racine (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS ASSISTED LIVING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant