This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 04:04:49 (UTC).

PATRICIA QUAN VS JAY BELSHAW

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 PATRICIA QUAN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against JAY BELSHAW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9065

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

QUAN PATRICIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

BELSHAW JAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KAHN ROBERT A. ESQ.

O'MEARA FRANCES MARY

Defendant Attorney

HIROTA MICHAEL NORIO

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/12/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT JAY BELSHAW'S NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

3/13/2018: DEFENDANT JAY BELSHAW'S NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

Unknown

3/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/13/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/14/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/14/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING RE 3/14/18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE 3/14/18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

12/20/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation

12/20/2018: Stipulation

Ex Parte Application

12/20/2018: Ex Parte Application

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/9/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

NOTICE OF RULING RE 1/11/18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE 1/11/18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

1/11/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

1/4/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/14/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

10/13/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAFNT FOR DAMAGES FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE

10/13/2017: COMPLAFNT FOR DAMAGES FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Patricia Quan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Jay Belshaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Stipulation for Continuance of Trial Date and Related Dates; Filed by Jay Belshaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and all Trial Related Dates); Filed by Jay Belshaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Minute Order ((DEFENDANT JAY BELSHAW'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIA...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE 3/14/18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Patricia Quan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Patricia Quan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Patricia Quan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • COMPLAFNT FOR DAMAGES FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC679065    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 47

Patricia Quan v. Jay Belshaw, et al.

MOTION TO ADVANCE TRIAL DATE

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Patricia Quan

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Defendant Jay Belshaw

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

Plaintiff alleges that Defendant committed legal malpractice when he prepared a will as to which Plaintiff was intended to be a beneficiary.

Plaintiff now moves to advance the trial date.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Patricia Quan’s motion to advance the trial date is DENIED.

DISCUSSION:

Motion To Advance Trial Date

Plaintiff moves to advance the trial date on the ground that the parties originally requested a continuance because a pending probate matter first had to conclude, and now that it has, a continuance is no longer necessary.

A request to advance a case for trial “may be granted only upon an affirmative showing by the moving party of good cause based on a declaration served and filed with the motion or application.” (CRC 3.1335(b).)

Plaintiff has shown no good cause here. Indeed, it’s not even close.

Plaintiff has also neglected to mention that the request for continuance that resulted in the August 2020 trial date was the second time the parties had requested a continuance. Trial was originally set for February 25, 2019, and pursuant to a stipulation of the parties, it was continued to July 1, 2019. The parties then requested another continuance, and that request was granted and resulted in the current trial date.

Plaintiff has given no adequate reason that this case should receive priority over the other cases set for trial between now and August 2020.[1] The fact that the parties’ original reason for requesting the continuance no longer applies does not magically create an opening in the Court’s docket. Nor has Plaintiff attempted to argue that this case is entitled to preference based on CCP § 36.

The motion to advance the trial date is DENIED.

Moving party to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: November 26, 2019 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Any party may submit on the tentative ruling by contacting the courtroom via email at Smcdept47@lacourt.org


[1]  Moreover, the simple fact is that this Court absolutely has no openings for trial before August 2020. It has 5-8 cases set for trial each and every Monday between now and March of 2021. Welcome to the World of the Independent Calendar Courts of Mosk.