This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 18:45:53 (UTC).

PATRICIA NEWMAN VS KELLY & GARRET ENTERPRISES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 PATRICIA NEWMAN filed an Other lawsuit against KELLY GARRET ENTERPRISES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0404

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWMAN PATRICIA

Defendants

HENTZEN KELLY

KELLY & GARRET ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/3/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/17/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

6/28/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

6/17/2022: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Patricia Newman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Patricia Newman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patricia Newman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patricia Newman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patricia Newman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL