This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 15:17:31 (UTC).

PATRICIA LOPEZ, ET AL. VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 PATRICIA LOPEZ, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1942

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ PATRICIA

LOPEZ SALVADOR

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y.

Defendant Attorney

TALLENT ERIN E

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/7/2022: Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/8/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

8/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

10/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/15/2022: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Patricia Lopez (Plaintiff); Salvador Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Patricia Lopez (Plaintiff); Salvador Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Patricia Lopez (Plaintiff); Salvador Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Patricia Lopez (Plaintiff); Salvador Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kevin Y. Jacobson (Attorney): Middle Name: Y.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Patricia Lopez (Plaintiff); Salvador Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patricia Lopez (Plaintiff); Salvador Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Patricia Lopez (Plaintiff); Salvador Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TALLENT ERIN