Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 03:26:21 (UTC).

PATRICIA G SORACCO VS FELIPA RUTHE RICHLAND ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 PATRICIA G SORACCO filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against FELIPA RUTHE RICHLAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2785

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SORACCO PATRICIA G.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

RICHLAND FELIPA RUTHE

RICHLAND AND ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BECKER BARTLEY L. ESQ.

BECKER BARTLEY LOUIS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/4/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CAE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2018: NOTICE OF CAE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS FELIPA RUTHE RICIILAND INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS RICHLAND AND ASSOCIATES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/13/2018: DEFENDANTS FELIPA RUTHE RICIILAND INDIVIDUALLY AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS RICHLAND AND ASSOCIATES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request for Judicial Notice

12/19/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Compel Discovery

4/29/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery

Proof of Service by Mail

4/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

5/23/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Motion

6/4/2019: Notice of Motion

Minute Order

6/7/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

6/7/2019: Unknown

Order

6/19/2019: Order

Minute Order

6/19/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

6/25/2019: Declaration

SUMMONS

4/19/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ELDER FINANCIAL FRAUD AND ABUSE UNDER THE ELDER AND DEPENDENT ADULT CIVIL PROTECTION ACT ("EADACPA") (WEIF. & INST. C. 15600 ET SEQ.) ;ETC

4/19/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ELDER FINANCIAL FRAUD AND ABUSE UNDER THE ELDER AND DEPENDENT ADULT CIVIL PROTECTION ACT ("EADACPA") (WEIF. & INST. C. 15600 ET SEQ.) ;ETC

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Declaration (OF BARTLEY L. BECKER RE PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO MEET AND CONFER AS TO PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED IN ADVANCE OF THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by Felipa Ruthe Richland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS A TERMINATING SANCTION) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Felipa Ruthe Richland (Defendant); Richland and Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Order (ORDER RE DEFENDANT EX PARTE APPLICATON TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT AS A TERMINATING SANCTION); Filed by Felipa Ruthe Richland (Defendant); Richland and Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (DEFENDANT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS A TERMINATING SANCTION); Filed by Felipa Ruthe Richland (Defendant); Richland and Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Motion to Dismiss (the Entirety of the Complaint as a Terminating Sanction pusuant to C.C.P. 2025.450(h) & 2023.030(d)); Filed by Felipa Ruthe Richland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Notice (of Advanced Hearing Date); Filed by Felipa Ruthe Richland (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • at 2:18 PM in Department 40; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re advancement of the 7/3/19 heari...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ELDER FINANCIAL FRAUD AND ABUSE UNDER THE ELDER AND DEPENDENT ADULT CIVIL PROTECTION ACT ("EADACPA") (WEIF. & INST. C. 15600 ET SEQ.) ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Patricia G. Soracco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Patricia G. Soracco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Request-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECKER BARTLEY L. ESQ.