This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 06:02:29 (UTC).

PATRICIA BROWN VS CHUBB LIMITED, A ZURICH, SWITZERLAND CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 PATRICIA BROWN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHUBB LIMITED, A ZURICH, SWITZERLAND CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1216

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN PATRICIA

Defendants

CHUBB LIMITED A ZURICH SWITZERLAND CORPORATION

CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES

CHUBB LIMITED

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FENSTER FRED A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/4/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

8/11/2021: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/5/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS CHUBB LIMITED AND CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES ONLY

8/11/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS CHUBB LIMITED AND CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES ONLY

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STRIKING ALLEGATION FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/23/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STRIKING ALLEGATION FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Striking Allegation From First Amended Complaint); Filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Defendants Chubb Limited and Chubb Group of Insurance Companies only); Filed by PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff); PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PATRICIA BROWN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FENSTER FRED A.