This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 00:51:25 (UTC).

PATRICIA ANNE CAIRNS, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 PATRICIA ANNE CAIRNS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3427

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAIRNS JOHN MURRAY

CAIRNS PATRICIA ANNE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

THE BOEING COMPANY

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRANGE BRIAN RUSSELL

Defendant Attorneys

HARRISON ROBERT W

MODLIN PETER S.

HUESTON ESQ JOHN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 12/08/2021

12/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 12/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

12/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/29/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

12/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

1/6/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

1/13/2022: Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP

1/19/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE, LP

Answer - DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

1/14/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint Of Defendant Universal Protection Service, LP); Filed by Universal Protection Service, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDefendant The Boeing Company's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by The Boeing Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Add-on to JCCP Petition; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSouthern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-on Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order re: Complex Determination); Filed by Patricia Anne Cairns (Plaintiff); John Murray Cairns (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:27 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 12/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patricia Anne Cairns (Plaintiff); John Murray Cairns (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patricia Anne Cairns (Plaintiff); John Murray Cairns (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patricia Anne Cairns (Plaintiff); John Murray Cairns (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant