This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 14:56:47 (UTC).

PATRICE DUREN VS SIGNATURE LANDS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 PATRICE DUREN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SIGNATURE LANDS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5958

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUREN PATRICE

Defendant

SIGNATURE LANDS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONNORS ARTHUR

Defendant Attorney

PARCELLS DAYTON B. III

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONS...)

11/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION RELATED ACCESSIBILI...)

10/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION RELATED ACCESSIBILI...)

Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

9/9/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55 - DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.

8/4/2020: Defendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55 - DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR STAY AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 55.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

9/3/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility C - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY CLAIM)]

9/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND EARLY EVALUATION CONFERENCE (CONSTRUCTION-RELATED ACCESSIBILITY CLAIM)]

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

6/26/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Proof of Personal Service

5/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/27/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibility Claim) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Early Evaluation Conference (Cons...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibility Claim) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Early Evaluation Conference (Construction Related Accessibili...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference (Construction-Related Accessibility Claim); Filed by Signature Lands, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Application for Stay and Early Evaluation Conference Pursuant to Civil Code Section 55.54; Filed by Signature Lands, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by Signature Lands, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARCELLS DAYTON B. III