This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 10:16:10 (UTC).

PATRICE DUREN VS LOWES HIW, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 PATRICE DUREN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOWES HIW, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUCE G. IWASAKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4058

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRUCE G. IWASAKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUREN PATRICE

Defendant

LOWES HIW INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUANE SHANNON DEI DUANE

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/6/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Mail

10/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING; ORDER

11/2/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING; ORDER

Notice of Settlement

11/10/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

3/1/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

3/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

9/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

8/25/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Proof of Personal Service

7/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/29/2021: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58, Bruce G. Iwasaki, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58, Bruce G. Iwasaki, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lowes HIW, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading); Filed by Lowes HIW, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading); Filed by Lowes HIW, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWE'S HIW INC is a litigant