This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 05:38:41 (UTC).

PATRICE DUREN VS CENTINELLA CAR WASH PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 PATRICE DUREN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CENTINELLA CAR WASH PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1618

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUREN PATRICE

Defendant

CENTINELLA CAR WASH PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUANE SHANNON DEI

Defendant Attorneys

MCCREARY DUNCAN

MCCREARY DUNCAN J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUNCAN MCCREARY

9/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DUNCAN MCCREARY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

9/8/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED I...)

9/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED I...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

8/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/26/2021

7/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 07/26/2021

Case Management Statement

7/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/25/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

3/26/2021: Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Hearing10/27/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Hearing09/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why sanctions should not be imposed in the amount of $250 each on Defendant and Defendant's counsel for their failure to appear at the Case Management Conference on 08/16/2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why sanctions should not be imposed i...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Centinella Car Wash Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Duncan McCreary); Filed by Centinella Car Wash Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 07/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Centinella Car Wash Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Patrice Duren (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTINELA CAR WASH PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCREARY DUNCAN