This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2022 at 11:16:59 (UTC).

PATEL, KEVIN RAMESH VS DE LA PORTE, JOLANI

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 PATEL, KEVIN RAMESH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DE LA PORTE, JOLANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6782

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATEL KEVIN RAMESH

Respondent

DE LA PORTE JOLANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BANH MEISA

Respondent Attorney

SCHNEIDER JULIA DREY

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/11/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

6/11/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Summons

6/11/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/11/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Separate Property

6/11/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/11/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

6/11/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Declarations)

3/30/2022: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Declarations)

Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations)

3/30/2022: Declaration - Income and Expense - Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

3/15/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Notice - Change of Address

12/15/2021: Notice - Change of Address

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/1/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

10/25/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service of Summons

10/4/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense (Declaration - Income and Expense (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Change of Address; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less