This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2022 at 22:01:20 (UTC).

PASQUALE MONTESANO VS GIULIA SEABRA MAGALHAES MARZUILLO

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 PASQUALE MONTESANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GIULIA SEABRA MAGALHAES MARZUILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6681

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTESANO PASQUALE

Defendant

MAGALHAES MARZUILLO GIULIA SEABRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNBAR DANIEL W.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/20/2021: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

8/2/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/25/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2024
  • Hearing07/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by PASQUALE MONTESANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PASQUALE MONTESANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PASQUALE MONTESANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PASQUALE MONTESANO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNBAR DANIEL