Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 06:12:04 (UTC).

PASQUA, GREG MICHAEL - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 PASQUA, GREG MICHAEL - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, BARBARA R. and PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9390

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSENBERG DONNA

Decedent

PASQUA GREG MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

LEADER LEE

LEADER LEE W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILLER RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Appointment Hearing 11/17/2017

10/18/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Appointment Hearing 11/17/2017

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

10/18/2017: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Hearing - Appointment Hearing 11/17/2017

10/18/2017: Notice - Hearing - Appointment Hearing 11/17/2017

Proof of Publication

10/27/2017: Proof of Publication

Declination to Act - Declination to be Estate Administrator and Nomination/ Consent for Donna Rosenberg to be Appointed Administrator

10/27/2017: Declination to Act - Declination to be Estate Administrator and Nomination/ Consent for Donna Rosenberg to be Appointed Administrator

Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Proof of Service

11/1/2017: Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Proof of Service

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

11/20/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Notice - Proposed Action

11/20/2017: Notice - Proposed Action

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

12/11/2017: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

1/26/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Petition - Allowance of Fees - FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES, AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

6/19/2018: Petition - Allowance of Fees - FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, ALLOWANCE OF STATUTORY FEES, AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

6/27/2018: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Supplement - To Final Report Of Administrator And Petition For Settlement, Allowance Of Statutory Fees, And For Final Distribution

8/30/2018: Supplement - To Final Report Of Administrator And Petition For Settlement, Allowance Of Statutory Fees, And For Final Distribution

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

8/31/2018: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

8/31/2018: Minute Order

Receipt - Receipt - Donna Rosenberg

10/3/2018: Receipt - Receipt - Donna Rosenberg

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

10/3/2018: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Receipt - Receipt - Barbara Pasqua

10/3/2018: Receipt - Receipt - Barbara Pasqua

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Receipt (Receipt - Richard T. Miller ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Receipt (Receipt - Barbara Pasqua ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Receipt (Receipt - Donna Rosenberg ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Order (Order Settling Final Report of Adminis ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • in Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment and Proof of Service ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Waiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Waiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Account ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Declination to Act (Declination to be Estate Administrator and Nomination/ Consent for Donna Rosenberg to be Appointed Administrator ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Notice - Order of Case Reassignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice - Hearing (Appointment Hearing 11/17/2017 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate (Appointment Hearing 11/17/2017 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T