This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2022 at 16:07:35 (UTC).

PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS SECOND STAGE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SECOND STAGE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0772

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

SECOND STAGE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMSPOKER TODD A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/7/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/5/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Hearing12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER. a California limited partnership (Plaintiff); As to: SECOND STAGE, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 10/17/2022; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER. a California limited partnership (Plaintiff); SECOND STAGE, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant); As to: SECOND STAGE, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant), SECOND STAGE, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant) to SECOND STAGE, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant), ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER. a California limited partnership (Plaintiff); As to: SECOND STAGE, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant); ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER. a California limited partnership (Plaintiff); As to: SECOND STAGE, LLC, a California limited liability corporation (Defendant); ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFFS TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO (Defendant); ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS TITLE THERETO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA HASTINGS CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMSPOKER TODD ADAMS