This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 09:58:08 (UTC).

PARVIZ SETAREH, ET AL. VS FRANK E. MERIDETH, JR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 PARVIZ SETAREH filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against FRANK E MERIDETH, JR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1709

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SOBELLA LLC

SETAREH PARVIZ

SETAREH SIMA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

MERIDETH FRANK E. JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

VAN HOESEN ANNAMARIE A.

Other Attorneys

AROUSTAMIAN ARA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

2/24/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/24/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/1/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • Hearing11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PARVIZ SETAREH (Plaintiff); SIMA SETAREH (Plaintiff); SOBELLA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by FRANK E. MERIDETH, JR. (Defendant); GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FRANK E. MERIDETH, JR. (Defendant); GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SIMA SETAREH (Cross-Defendant); PARVIZ SETAREH (Cross-Defendant); SOBELLA, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by FRANK E. MERIDETH, JR. (Defendant); GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FRANK E. MERIDETH, JR. (Defendant); GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PARVIZ SETAREH (Plaintiff); SIMA SETAREH (Plaintiff); SOBELLA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PARVIZ SETAREH (Plaintiff); SIMA SETAREH (Plaintiff); SOBELLA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PARVIZ SETAREH (Plaintiff); SIMA SETAREH (Plaintiff); SOBELLA, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant