This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 00:56:59 (UTC).

PARUL DOSHI VS SOON H YEOM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 PARUL DOSHI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOON H YEOM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0351

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOSHI PARUL

Defendants

KIM KYUNG MI

YEOM SOON H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG RANDY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Parul Doshi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Parul Doshi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Parul Doshi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RANDY