Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2021 at 08:41:33 (UTC).

PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS SIVAN W. OLIVIA

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIVAN W OLIVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0476

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

OLIVIA SIVAN W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VORONIN YURI

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

4/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • Hearing08/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Partners Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Partners Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Partners Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Partners Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARTNERS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant