This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 13:38:58 (UTC).

PARNY MILIEN VS KORDA CONSTRUCTION CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 PARNY MILIEN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KORDA CONSTRUCTION CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6104

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

MILIEN PARNY

Respondents and Defendants

KORDA CONSTRUCTION CO.

R.P.K. DEVELOPMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOPPER DAVID CAMERON

BERENJI SHADIE LATAE

Defendant Attorney

KATZ JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED 3/30/22; B320266

6/27/2022: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED 3/30/22; B320266

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED 3/30/22; B320266

7/18/2022: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - APPEAL - NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL, FILED 3/30/22; B320266

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

5/3/2022: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

4/12/2022: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/28/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/28/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

3/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

3/30/2022: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)

4/5/2022: Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)

Notice of Related Case

3/22/2022: Notice of Related Case

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

3/30/2022: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Appearance

10/28/2021: Notice of Appearance

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/29/2021: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE]

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE]

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

11/5/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DALE MARSHALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/3/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DALE MARSHALL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 3/30/22; B320266); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (for Notice of Appeal, filed 3/30/22; B320266); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Parny Milien (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Parny Milien (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docketat 10:24 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of 03/28/2022, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:43 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 08/13/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Parny Milien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Parny Milien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Parny Milien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Parny Milien (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KORDA CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERENJI SHADIE LATAE