Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2019 at 00:26:38 (UTC).

PARMINDER SINGH ET AL VS HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 PARMINDER SINGH filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO, GEORGINA T. RIZK, GREGORY KEOSIAN, DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB, DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB and LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4194

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

GEORGINA T. RIZK

GREGORY KEOSIAN

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB

LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BLAAUW JANNA

HOLLENBECK CHRISTINA LOUISE

LECLAIR AMY

SINGH PARMINDER

CORTEZ JONNIE LYNN

Defendants and Respondents

SKULL BASE INSTITUTE

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC

SKULL BASE FOUNDATION

SHAHINIAN HRAYR M.D.

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

LOS ROBLES HOSPITAL & MEDICAL CENTER

ROSE BILLING

THOUSAND OAKS SURGICAL HOSPITAL

BILLING ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

QUINN KEVIN F. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

THIES LEE M.

WEBER JOHN J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/5/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRETT J. SCHREIBER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THOUSAND OAKS SURGICAL HOSPITAL AND LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COM

9/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRETT J. SCHREIBER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS THOUSAND OAKS SURGICAL HOSPITAL AND LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) FILE...)

9/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) FILE...)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

9/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

3/23/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Motion to Consolidate

2/8/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Opposition - Opposition OF DEFENDANTS THOUSAND OAKS SURGICAL HOSPITAL AND LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

2/21/2019: Opposition - Opposition OF DEFENDANTS THOUSAND OAKS SURGICAL HOSPITAL AND LOS ROBLES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

Reply - Reply Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate

2/28/2019: Reply - Reply Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

3/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

COMPLAINT

2/15/2018: COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

9/20/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Motion of Defendants Thousand Oaks Surgical Hospital and Los Robles Regional Medical Center

11/2/2018: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Motion of Defendants Thousand Oaks Surgical Hospital and Los Robles Regional Medical Center

Declaration - Declaration of John J. Weber

11/2/2018: Declaration - Declaration of John J. Weber

Minute Order -

9/5/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

8/3/2018: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • Hearing11/06/2019 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Hearing11/06/2019 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (Filed by Defendants Thousand Oaks Surgical Hospital and Los Robles Regional Medical Center to Plaintiff's Complaint;) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Court's Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference and Hearing on Demurrer and Motion to Strike); Filed by Parminder Singh (Plaintiff); Janna Blaauw (Plaintiff); Amy Leclair (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) File...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketReply (to Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint); Filed by Thousand Oaks Surgical Hospital (Defendant); Los Robles Hospital & Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketReply (to Opposition to Motion to strike portions of the Complaint); Filed by Thousand Oaks Surgical Hospital (Defendant); Los Robles Hospital & Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendants Thousand Oaks Surgical Hospital and Los Robles Regional Medical Center's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint); Filed by Parminder Singh (Plaintiff); Janna Blaauw (Plaintiff); Amy Leclair (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 91; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hrayr M.D. Shahinian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHIN1AN, M.D.''S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Hrayr M.D. Shahinian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Parminder Singh (Plaintiff); Janna Blaauw (Plaintiff); Amy Leclair (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Los Robles Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SKULL BASE INSTITUTE is a litigant