This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 23:20:51 (UTC).

PARKER WORSHAM VS YSHRE LA, LLC.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 PARKER WORSHAM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YSHRE LA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1992

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORSHAM PARKER

Defendant

YSHRE LA LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PARKER WORSHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PARKER WORSHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PARKER WORSHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PARKER WORSHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YSHRE LA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN