This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2023 at 13:17:02 (UTC).

PARKER RASMUSSEN VS TAREK BITTAR, MD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 PARKER RASMUSSEN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TAREK BITTAR, MD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0544

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RASMUSSEN PARKER

Defendants

BITTAR MD TAREK

HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOCHEZ LUGO ANDRES S.

WOLF JEFFREY D.

Defendant Attorneys

LAMB MICHAEL VINCENT

WERRE GREGORY D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/4/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/30/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

1/17/2023: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 437C STIPULATION RE: HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

1/13/2023: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 437C STIPULATION RE: HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Answer

10/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/14/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/12/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/12/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/19/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2024
  • Hearing01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2023
  • Hearing11/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47 updated: Result Date to 04/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: TAREK BITTAR, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PARKER RASMUSSEN (Plaintiff); As to: HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/12/2022; Service Cost: 77.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PARKER RASMUSSEN (Plaintiff); As to: TAREK BITTAR, MD (Defendant); HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PARKER RASMUSSEN (Plaintiff); As to: TAREK BITTAR, MD (Defendant); HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PARKER RASMUSSEN (Plaintiff); As to: TAREK BITTAR, MD (Defendant); HENRY MAYO NEWHALL MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less