This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 09:52:43 (UTC).

PARK BALBOA, L.P., DOING BUSINESS AS THE GARDENS AT PARK BALBOA VS ARMANDO CLAVIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 PARK BALBOA, L P , DOING BUSINESS AS THE GARDENS AT PARK BALBOA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARMANDO CLAVIO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3107

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK BALBOA L.P. DOING BUSINESS AS THE GARDENS AT PARK BALBOA

Defendants

CLAVIO ARMANDO

INTEGRAL SENIOR LIVING LLC DBA VALLEY VISTA SENIOR LIVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERKE JEFF

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/10/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/01/2020

12/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/01/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/1/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/23/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT

12/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE EXHIBIT TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

4/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Errata Re Exhibit to Complaint); Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:12 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Park Balboa, L.P., doing business as The Gardens at Park Balboa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less