This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 21:32:10 (UTC).

PARADA, ORLANDO ABISAI - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 PARADA, ORLANDO ABISAI - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7820

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEJIA JUDY XIOMARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RULSKY JERRY

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

8/10/2021: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Declaration - Of Judy Xiomara Mejia In Lieu Of Medical Records

8/10/2021: Declaration - Of Judy Xiomara Mejia In Lieu Of Medical Records

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

8/10/2021: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Minute Order

9/24/2021: Minute Order

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

9/23/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

9/23/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Judy Xiomara Mejia In Lieu Of Medical Records ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RULSKY JERRY