Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 05:43:30 (UTC).

PAPER FIRST AFFILIATES LLC VS PREMIERE PROPS INC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 PAPER FIRST AFFILIATES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PREMIERE PROPS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7634

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PAPER FIRST AFFILIATES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

PREMIERE PROPS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MURPHY ELIZABETH H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

5/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/5/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/11/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

7/11/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

12/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

12/20/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • at 2:30 PM in Department 71; Court Order (Court Order; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Paper First Affiliates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 71; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Not Held-Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Paper First Affiliates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Paper First Affiliates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIERE PROPS INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY ELIZABETH H.