This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 13:41:26 (UTC).

PAOLA ANDREA GIL VS YU LING TYSON

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 PAOLA ANDREA GIL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YU LING TYSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6526

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIL PAOLA ANDREA

Defendant

TYSON YU LING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHABY DAVID M. II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Paola Andrea Gil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Paola Andrea Gil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paola Andrea Gil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paola Andrea Gil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Paola Andrea Gil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Paola Andrea Gil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHABY DAVID MICHAEL II