This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2023 at 07:51:51 (UTC).

PANG LING CHANG VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 PANG LING CHANG filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0111

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG PANG LING

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

SUNRISE FORD INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOLONZ ADAM MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/4/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/4/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/4/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/4/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/8/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 57 - Hon. Michael Smalleffective 02/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pang Ling Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Service Date: 02/02/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pang Ling Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunrise Ford Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pang Ling Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunrise Ford Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pang Ling Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Sunrise Ford Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less