This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2021 at 01:01:08 (UTC).

PAMELA ZOLALIAN VS ROCHELLE LEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 PAMELA ZOLALIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROCHELLE LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1232

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ZOLALIAN PAMELA

Respondents and Defendants

LEE ROCHELLE

DOES 1 TO 25

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

GILBERT DANIEL M. ESQ.

GILBERT DANIEL M ESQ.

LAZAROVITS KELLEY JEAN

Defendant Attorneys

ARUN MUKUND S.

PALTA AMIT CABOT ESQ.

ARUN MUKUND S. ESQ.

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER EDWARD ESQ.

MYERS JEFFREY CABOT

 

Court Documents

Answer -

10/5/2018: Answer -

Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT

10/5/2018: Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT

Association of Attorney

1/17/2019: Association of Attorney

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

8/30/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO C...)

8/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHOR...)

12/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHOR...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION - DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

12/20/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION - DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/08/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/08/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/08/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)]

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/08/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Association of Attorney

12/10/2020: Association of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

3/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF MAILING ADDRESS

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/23/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

3/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMIT PALTA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ROCHELLE LEE

3/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMIT PALTA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ROCHELLE LEE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - AS ASSOCIATED C...)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - AS ASSOCIATED C...)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/21/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • Hearing04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Jury Trial (estimated at 5 to 7 days) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (as Counsel for Defendant Rochelle Lee, Filed by Jeffrey Cabot Meyers, Esq. of Kirk & Myers) - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as Counsel for De...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial); Filed by ROCHELLE LEE (Defendant); ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Amit Palta in Support of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant Rochelle Lee); Filed by ROCHELLE LEE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel (for Defendant Rochelle Lee); Filed by Jeffrey Cabot Myers (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney ((associating Jeffrey Cabot Myers of Kirk & Myers)); Filed by Jeffrey Cabot Myers (Attorney); Mukund S. Arun, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketOther - (CIVIL DEPOSIT); Filed by ROCHELLE LEE (Defendant); ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ROCHELLE LEE (Defendant); ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PAMELA ZOLALIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1232    Hearing Date: May 18, 2021    Dept: 29

Zolalian  vs.  Lee ,et. al.

TENTATIVE

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Jeffrey Cabot Myers (“Myers”), of Kirk & Myers, is DENIED.

Counsel has failed to comply with the following and must remedy these deficiencies if a second motion is filed:

Counsel has not complied with California Rules of Court 3.1362(e). 

Counsel must indicate all the future hearing dates on Form MC-053 (CRC Rule 3.1362(e)).

A Final Status Conference for this case is scheduled on March 22, 2022, while a jury trial is scheduled for April 5, 2022. However, the Proposed Order does not specify all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including date of trial - the proposed order is blank.  CRC Rule 3.1362(e).

Moving party is ordered to give notice. 



Case Number: ****1232    Hearing Date: April 16, 2021    Dept: 29

Pamela Zolalian vs. Rochelle Lee et al.

TENTATIVE  Ruling:

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant, Rochelle Lee is DENIED without prejudice. Counsel remains counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice. 

Analysis:

CCP section 284 permits the Court to grant leave to an attorney to withdraw from representing a party.  CRC rule 3.1362 requires that a motion for leave to withdraw to be drafted on specified forms for the notice (form MC-051), the declaration (form MC-052), and the proposed order (form MC-053).   CRC rule 3.1362 requires that each of these forms, including the proposed order, be served on the client. The Court has discretion to deny an attorney's request to withdraw where such withdrawal would work an injustice or cause undue delay in the proceeding.  (Mandell v. Superior Court (1977) 67 Cal. App. 3d 1, 4.) 

The Court finds that Counsel filed the notice and declaration. However, Counsel did not comply with CRC rule 3.1362 because no copy of the proposed order was filed with the Court or served on the client. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED without prejudice unless counsel remedies the defects by the hearing date.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZAROVITS KELLEY JEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILBERT DANIEL