This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2023 at 10:29:14 (UTC).

PAMELA PONTRELLI VS MICHAEL CHOI

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 PAMELA PONTRELLI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICHAEL CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1715

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PONTRELLI PAMELA

Defendant

CHOI MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FACCHETTI ADRIANOS

TEDFORD JAMES ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

BIRCH YVONNE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/25/2022

8/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/25/2022

Notice of Settlement

8/25/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/20/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

5/26/2022: Association of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/6/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/6/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/6/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/6/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Pamela Pontrelli on 04/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Pamela Pontrelli as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Pamela Pontrelli (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Choi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Pamela Pontrelli (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/25/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pamela Pontrelli (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Choi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pamela Pontrelli (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Choi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less