This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2020 at 07:35:32 (UTC).

PAMELA LOAR VS JENNIFER PEDERSEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 PAMELA LOAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JENNIFER PEDERSEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3780

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LOAR PAMELA

Defendants and Respondents

PEDERSON BRIT H. DECD. TRUST

PEDERSEN JENNIFER

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CLAY R. SIDES

Defendant Attorneys

DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH

DOHERTY JOHN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

10/2/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

10/2/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

Answer

1/16/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/16/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/24/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/4/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

11/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/21/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/21/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Substitution of Attorney

10/17/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

10/17/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/26/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

8/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Pamela Loar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant); Pederson, Brit H. Decd. Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff to 1. Answer Demand for Production of Documents and Things, Set One; 2. in the Alternative, to Exclude Evidence and 3. to Pay Costs and Sanctions against Plaintiff and Her Attorney of Record in the Amount of $1,261.65;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff to 1. Answer Form Interrogatories, Set 1; 2. in the Alternative, to Exclude Evidence; 3. Pay Costs and Sanctions against Plaintiff and Her Attorney in the Amount of $1,261.65;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Pederson, Brit H. Decd. Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Pamela Loar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant); Pederson, Brit H. Decd. Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jennifer Pedersen (Defendant); Pederson, Brit H. Decd. Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pamela Loar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less